Ree v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: John Francis Ree, Jr.
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 4:2013cv00746
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Leslie A Bowman (PS)
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 17 in full. It is further ordered that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) is denied and this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. The Court concludes that a certificate of appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/18/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
November 6, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 17 . The portion of the magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation that recommends dismissing the first three counts of the Petition is accepted and adopted, and the first three counts of the Petition (Doc. 1 ) are dismissed with prejudice to the extent that they allege independent claims of constitutional errors that occurred prior to Petitioner's guilty plea. The Court declines to adopt the portion of the report that recommends dismissing the fourth count of the Petition. On or before November 20, 2014, Respondents shall file a supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 11/5/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
September 16, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge, enter an order Denying the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636 (b), any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. If objections are not timely filed, they may be deemed waived. The Local Rules permit a response to an objection. They do not permit a reply to a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/16/14.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ree v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Francis Ree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?