Pinson v. Unknown Party et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeremy Pinson |
Defendant: |
Unknown Party and Bureau of Prisons |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv02059 |
Filed: |
December 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Tucson Division Office |
County: |
Pinal |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se (Tucson) |
Presiding Judge: |
David C Bury |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 28, 2022 |
Filing
165
ORDER that within 7 days of the filing date of this Order, the parties shall memorialize and file their voluntary consent in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73, to have a United States magistrate judge conduct a ny and all further proceedings in the case, including the trial, order the entry of a final judgment, and conduct all post- judgment proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that this case is assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Bruce G. Macdo nald, for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment, and the foregoing consent of the parties. All further documents filed with the court are to carry the following case number: CV-13-02059-TUC-BGM. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 2/22/22. (JAM)
|
March 23, 2020 |
Filing
140
ORDER that the Motion to Seal (Doc. 138 ) is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file the Form 583 Report of Incident (Doc. 139 ) UNDER SEAL. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/20/2020. (MFR)
|
March 12, 2020 |
Filing
136
ORDERED that the Renewed Motion to Compel (Doc. 127 ) is GRANTED as follows: 1) Defendant shall disclose the DHO packet for the Incident Report and the FBI referral referenced in the Inmate Discipline Update. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 7 day s of the filing date of this Order, the Defendant shall file its Response to present any objections to disclosing the redacted names on the 8-28-23 Inmate Roster, and thereafter within 7 days, the Plaintiff shall file a Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NO FURTHER DISCOVERY SHALL BE CONDUCTED IN THIS CASE, except as referenced above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Counsel (Doc. 126 ) is GRANTED, and that subsequent to securing pro bono counsel to represent the Defendant at trial, the Court shall issue an Order appointing counsel and setting the case for a Pretrial Conference. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/11/2020. (MCO)
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing
120
ORDERED that the Motion to Compel (Doc. 114 ) is DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 118 ) is GRANTED the dispositive motions deadline is reset to October 24, 2019 and the Joint Pretrial Ord er due date is reset to November 23, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 7 days of the filing date of this Order, Counsel for BOP shall tender the draft Protective Order to the Plaintiff, who shall have 7 days to sign and return it. [Review ORDER for details.] Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/27/2019. (MCO)
|
August 28, 2019 |
Filing
115
ORDER that the Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 113 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/28/2019. (ARC)
|
August 21, 2019 |
Filing
112
ORDERED that the Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Doc. 111 ) is DENIED, without prejudice to it being reurged either at the time of the Privacy Act dispositive motion or trial. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/21/2019. (ARC)
|
August 14, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Request for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 107 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/14/2019. (MCO)
|
March 11, 2019 |
Filing
98
ORDER that the Motion for Subpoena (Doc. 95 ) requested for issuance to the House Government Oversight and Reform Committee for materials related to misconduct by high-ranking BOP officials and coverup by DOJ officials is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall complete service by certified mail of the Summons, the First Amended Complaint, and a copy of this Order, immediately. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/11/2019. (MCO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?