Joshua David Mellberg LLC et al v. Will et al
Plaintiff: Joshua David Mellberg LLC and Joshua David Mellberg
Defendant: Jovan Will, Tree Fine, Impact Partnership LLC, John Steve Arceo, Jane Doe Arceo, Fernando Godinez, Jane Doe Godinez, Patricia Latham, John Doe Latham, Carly Uretz and John Doe Uretz
Case Number: 4:2014cv02025
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Presiding Judge: Charles R Pyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDERED JDM's Motion to Strike (Doc. 583 ) is GRANTED. Statement included in the declarations of William P. Eiselstein and Stephen W. Odom, Jr., related to settlement discussions between the parties are stricken and will not be considered by th e Court. JDM's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 565 ) is DENIED. Individual Defendants' Motion For Award of Attorneys' Fees And Non-Taxable Expenses (Doc. 568 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Impact's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses (Doc. 570 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/24/21. (See attached Order for complete details.) (MYE)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDERED Impact's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses 479 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' First Motion to Supplement the Record 539 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Supplement the Record 545 is GRANTED. Report and Recommend ation 531 is ADOPTED except as to the finding Impact has an ownership interest in FormulaFolios. Plaintiffs Objections (Doc. 541) are overruled. Impact's Objections II through VI (Doc. 542) are overruled. Impact's Objection VII as to the ownership interest of FormulaFolios is sustained. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages as to Claims 1-5 and 7-10 455 , Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant Impact's Counterclaim 333 , Defendants Fine and Will's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim 6 329 are GRANTED. Defendants Fine and Will's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims 1, 5, 7, and 8 329 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 2, 3, 9, and 10 332 , Defendant Will's Motion for Summary Judgment on Claim 6 as to Damages 453 , JDM and Defendants Fine and Godinez's cross-motions for summary judgment on Claim 4 (Docs. 338 , 365 ), Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions 382 , Impact's Motion to Strike 448 , and Impact's Motion to Disqualify a Witness 450 are DENIED AS MOOT. Summary Judgment is awarded in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs as to the claims in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Summary judgment is awarded in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants as to the Counterclaims. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and shall then close its file in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/20/20. (MYE)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDERED: The 480 Report and Recommendation is adopted. Plaintiff's 449 Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant Arceo and Enter Default is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall strike Defendant John Steve Arceos Answer and enter his default. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/15/2019. (BAR)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting 310 Motion for Sanctions to Exclude Plaintiffs' Untimely Damages Evidence. Mr. Crooks's lay testimony in the form of the September 2018 disclosure is excluded. Mr. Crooks may not provide testimony as a lay or expert witness in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 4/16/2019. (See attached Order for complete information) (DLC)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 82 Report and Recommendation. Defendant Impact Partnerships 55 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is denied. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Charles R. Pyle for all pretr ial proceedings and any reports and recommendations as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) and L.R.Civ.P. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: 14-CV-02025-TUC-CKJ (CRP). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/11/2016. (KEP)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Report and Recommendation 45 is ADOPTED; The pending motions (Docs. 22 , 27 , 30 , and 34 ) are granted and denied as set forth in this Order. Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order as set forth herein and in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/27/2015. (See Order for details)(ALS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua David Mellberg LLC et al v. Will et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua David Mellberg LLC
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: David Nunzio Ferrucci
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua David Mellberg
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: David Nunzio Ferrucci
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovan Will
Represented By: Mark L Collins
Represented By: Michael Stephen Woodlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree Fine
Represented By: Mark L Collins
Represented By: Michael Stephen Woodlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Partnership LLC
Represented By: Sherry Janssen Downer
Represented By: William P Eiselstein
Represented By: George Oscar Krauja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Steve Arceo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Arceo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carly Uretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Uretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?