Hartman v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Plaintiff: George Allen Hartman
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 4:2014cv02090
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Charles R Pyle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; and adopting 69 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's battery claim remains pending and the case remains referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce MacDonald. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/12/2016. (SIB)
June 1, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge enter an order denying 57 United States of America's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and granting 52 United States of America's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Any party may serve and file written objections within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 5/31/2016. (BAR)
September 30, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED adopting Report and Recommendations re 22 Report and Recommendation. Further ordered granting in part and denying in part 12 Partial Motion to Dismiss as follows: granted as to the First through Third and Fifth through Ninth Causes of Action are dismissed with prejudice; granted as to all Defendants except the United States of America, with Defendants CBP, ICE, United States Department of Homeland Security, and Unknown Named Agents John Does 1-10 being dismissed, and Plaintiff has leave to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/30/2015.(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Allen Hartman
Represented By: Roberto C Montiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?