Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Jewell et al
Plaintiff: |
Center for Biological Diversity and Defenders of Wildlife |
Defendant: |
Sally Jewell and United States Fish and Wildlife Service |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00019 |
Filed: |
January 16, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Tucson Division Office |
County: |
Pima |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer G Zipps |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
16 U.S.C. § 1538 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 28, 2021 |
Filing
274
ORDERED that Federal Defendants' Motion to Modify Deadline for Completion of Remand (Doc. 267) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order (Doc. 215 in CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ and Doc. 106 in CV-16-00094-TUC-JGZ) and Final J udgment (Doc. 244 in CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ and Doc. 112 in CV-16-00094-TUC-JGZ) are MODIFIED as follows: Federal Defendants shall have thirty-nine (39) months to issue a final, revised 10(j) rule in accordance with the Courts March 31, 2018 Order. Federal Defendants shall issue the final rule on or before July 1, 2022. (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/27/2021. (MCO)
|
March 31, 2018 |
Filing
200
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED in lead case CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, Plaintiff CBD's 114 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. Federal Defendants' 123 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DEN IED. Defendant-Intervenor Arizona's 129 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. In consolidated case CV-15-00285-TUC-JGZ, Plaintiff WEG's Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 111 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. Federal Defendants' 133 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 133) is DENIED. Defendant-Intervenor Arizona's 141 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 141 ) is DENIED. In consolidated case No. CV-15-00179-TUC-JGZ, Plaintiff the Coalition's Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 108 ) is DENIED. Federal Defendants 137 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 1 37) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. Defendant-Intervenor CBD's 147 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (CV-15-00019-TUC-JGZ, doc. 147) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. In r elated case CV-16-00094-TUC-JGZ, Plaintiff SCI's Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 67) is DENIED. Federal Defendants Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 70) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. Defendant-Inter venor CBD's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 78) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART to the extent provided herein. The 1/16/15 final rule, 80 Fed. Reg. 2512, et seq., is REMANDED to the Service for further action consistent with this o rder. The final rule shall remain in effect until the Service issues a new final rule for experimental population of Mexican gray wolves, or otherwise remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order, at which time the 1/16/15 final rule will be superseded. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, parties shall provide to the Court a proposed deadline for publication of a revised 10(j) rulemaking or other remedial action. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/31/18.(BAC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?