Morales-Alfonso v. Francisco Enterprises Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Jorge Morales-Alfonso
Defendant: Francisco Enterprises Incorporated, Tohono O'odham Swap Meet, Esmeralda Francisco, Ricardo Campillo, Rupert Mendez, Jorge Torres and Julian Garcia
Case Number: 4:2015cv00200
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Bowman's 49 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in its entirety. The 35 Application for Entry of Default and 38 Motion to Strike are denied. Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Bowman for any remaining pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 1/6/2017.(BAR)
April 14, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 20 . Defendants' Motion to dismiss (Doc. 11 ) is denied. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Bowman for any remaining pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 4/14/16. (KAH)
December 7, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court enter an order denying the 11 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 12/7/2015. (BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales-Alfonso v. Francisco Enterprises Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Morales-Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Enterprises Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tohono O'odham Swap Meet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmeralda Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Campillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?