Twitchell v. Allied Pilots Association
Plaintiff: Andrea B Twitchell
Defendant: Allied Pilots Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv00493
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel discovery from American Airlines is DENIED. American Airlines' Motion to Quash is GRANTED. APA's Motion to Compel Production of Documents is GRANTED IN PART for disclosure of the 2014 Settlement Agr eement and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART as to Plaintiff's assertion of work product privilege. Within 7 days of the filing date of this Order, American Airlines shall prepare the confidentiality agreement and provide it to the Plaintiff and th e APA. Within 14 days from the filing date of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file a work product privilege log. In the event the case is not resolved by settlement, the Court shall rule on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; the Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's recently filed Motion Re: Interrogatory Requests shall be due within 14 days of the settlement conference. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/6/19. (KAH)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER that this matter is set for a Settlement Conference on Tuesday, 3/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 2/5/2019. (MFR)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 91 Motion for Subpoena to Depose Ed Sicher. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue the subpoena to depose Ed Sicher and mail a copy of subpoena to the Plaintiff for service. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 10/24/18. (BAC)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 77 Motion to Compel Re: Confidentiality Agreement is DENIED as moot, pursuant to the parties 86 Stipulation. The 78 Motion to Compel Re: Insurance Policy is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 10/11/18. (BAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitchell v. Allied Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea B Twitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?