Parish v. Lansdale et al
Plaintiff: |
Miles Parish |
Defendant: |
Troy Lansdale, Bradley Kush, Roberto Villasenor, Tucson, City of and Unknown Parties |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00186 |
Filed: |
April 26, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Tucson Division Office |
County: |
Pima |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer G Zipps |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2021 |
Filing
269
ORDERED that the Plaintiff's and Defendant Lansdale's 268 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until July 2, 2021 to File Plaintiff's Fee Application is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/25/2021. (ARC)
|
May 17, 2021 |
Filing
197
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 165 JOINT Motion in Limine. This Order only addresses objections related to the failure to disclose and does not address other appropriate objections under the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/17/2021. (See attached Order for complete details) (DLC)
|
May 7, 2021 |
Filing
185
ORDERED: Defendants' "Joint Motion in Limine #1: for Separate Trials before the Same Jury on Individual Officer Liability (Phase One), and Monell Liability (Phase Two)" (Doc. 111 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Lansdale and Kush's &quo t;Motion in Limine No. 1 Regarding Preclusion of Internal Affairs Investigation Materials" (Doc. 99 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to Phase One of the trial as stated within the body of this Order. Defendants Lansdale and Kush' s Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude TPD General Orders (Doc. 100 ) is GRANTED as to Phase One of the trial, to the extent stated in this Order. Defendants Lansdale and Kush's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Letter from TPD to Plaintiff Advi sing that Plaintiff's Complaint was Sustained (Doc. 103 ) is GRANTED with regard to Phase One of the trial. Defendants Lansdale and Kush's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude the TPD Letter of Reprimand Given to Defendant Lansdale (Doc. 104 ) is GRANTED with regard to Phase One of the trial. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/6/2021. (ARC)
|
April 21, 2021 |
Filing
169
ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Motion in Limine # 1: Preclude Speculative and Irrelevant Opinion Re: Drug/Alcohol Use" (Doc. 121 ) is GRANTED. Defendants may not question witnesses, refer to, or present argument relating to (1) Dr. Day's notes that Plaintiff was intoxicated and smelled of alcohol and marijuana, or (2) Plaintiff's statement that Dr. Day made the notes because he might have been biased against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/21/21. (MYE)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
88
ORDER Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 63 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants Troy Lansdale's and Bradley Kush's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 64 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Pla intiff's negligence claims and claim for punitive damages as to his state causes of action are dismissed. Defendants City of Tucson and Chief of Police's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 66 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The TPD Police Chief is DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties shall file the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order on or before October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 9/30/2019. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?