Tamez v. Din et al
Plaintiff: Mario Tamez
Defendant: Cochise County Jail, First Baptist Church, Moeen Din, Cochise County Sheriff's Department, Randy Garcia, Open MRI Solutions, Benson Police Department and Ann Roberts
Case Number: 4:2018cv00468
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 the above-captioned case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All remaining pending motions are DISMISSED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court shall close its file in this matter. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 10/17/2018. (MCO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/Withdraw from the Case by Mario Tamez. (1 page) (SIB)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 10/1/2018. (MCO)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mario Tamez. (1 page) (KEP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Mario Tamez. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (MCO)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Ordered that Plaintiffs leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted however, for the reasons explained in Order, the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 10/1/2018. (See ORDER for complete details) (MCO)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KEP)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M. Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-468-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mario Tamez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamez v. Din et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Baptist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moeen Din
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open MRI Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benson Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Tamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?