Ewing v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jason Ewing
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00489
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bernardo P Velasco
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Auto-Owners Insurance Company answer due 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 11/16/2018. (MCO)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Election Form Deadline re-sent to Plaintiff on this date (BAC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16010173. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bernardo P Velasco. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-00489-TUC-BPV. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jason Ewing. (Dennis, Patrick) (MCO)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16010173 filed by Jason Ewing. (Dennis, Patrick) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ewing
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Charles Gorman
Represented By: Donald L Myles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?