Gesty v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Denise Gesty
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00533
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Gesty: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons upon U.S. Attorney on 12/07/2018. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Gesty: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons upon U.S. Attorney for Arizona on 12/14/2018. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Denise Gesty. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, #6 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Plaintiff Denise Gesty. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, #6 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Plaintiff Denise Gesty. (Attachments: #1 Summons TSA)(Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 8, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Lawrence Vogelman on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Denise Gesty. (Attachments: #1 Summons USA - DHS, #2 Summons USA - TSA)(Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Denise Gesty. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Denise Gesty. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16143739. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C. Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-533-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16143739 filed by Denise Gesty. (Gattone, Paul / Vogelman, Lawrence)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesty v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Gesty
Represented By: Lawrence A Vogelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?