Tucson, City of et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Tucson, City of and Marana, Town of
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Incorporated, National Foam Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company and Minnesota Mining Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00612
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the District of South Carolina. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-087. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 10, 2019 Case Transferred to the District of South Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) Transferring Case to the District of South Carolina Re MDL-2873. (MAP)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the #4 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint is partially approved. The deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to January 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 12/27/2018. (BAR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16340717. This case has been assigned to the Honorable (Lite, Jeremy). All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-612-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Chemguard Incorporated, National Foam Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Lite, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SIB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Lite, Jeremy) (SIB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Incorporated. (Lite, Jeremy) (SIB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20185523. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16340717 filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Incorporated. (Lite, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Consent to Removal)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson, City of et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Michael L Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan Shawn Patterson
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Represented By: J Liat Rome
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Arredondo
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Incorporated
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Lloyd
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Ryan Shawn Patterson
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Represented By: J Liat Rome
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Arredondo
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Richard F Bulger
Represented By: Tyler Alfermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Richard F Bulger
Represented By: Tyler Alfermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson, City of
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Kevin David Neal
Represented By: Louise Caro
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Kenneth Noel Ralston
Represented By: Aaron Modiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marana, Town of
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Kevin David Neal
Represented By: Louise Caro
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Kenneth Noel Ralston
Represented By: Aaron Modiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?