Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC v. Tomato Specialties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC
Defendant: Yvette Castro, Isaac Castro and Tomato Specialties LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00619
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: 18-CV-00619-TUC-RM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 3/18/19 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b). Show Cause Hearing is set for 3/18/2019 at 10:20 AM before Judge Raner C Collins. (Attachments: #1 Consent form)(BAC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Corp. Disclosure; Consent to Exercise Magistrate; Notice to Parties (DE 1,2,4,6) upon Yvette Castro on 2/9/19. (Nurenberg, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Corp. Disclosure; Consent to Exercise Magistrate; Notice to Parties (DE 1,2,4,6) upon TOMATO SPECIALTIES, LLC d/b/a THE AVOCADO COMPANY INTL, an Arizona limited liability company, by serving Isaac Castro, its statutory agent on 2/9/19. (Nurenberg, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Corp. Disclosure; Consent to Exercise Magistrate; Notice to Parties (DE 1,2,4,6) upon Isaac Castro on 2/9/19. (Nurenberg, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline re-sent on this date. (BAC)
December 28, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Steven Nurenberg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Isaac Castro, Yvette Castro, Tomato Specialties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16350612. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-619-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC. (Nurenberg, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC.(Nurenberg, Steven) (ARC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16350612 filed by Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC. (Nurenberg, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC v. Tomato Specialties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomato Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfalia Fruit Marketing USA LLC
Represented By: Steven E Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?