Watts v. Regional Acceptance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Watts
Defendant: Regional Acceptance Corporation, Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated and Loss Prevention Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Loss Prevention Services LLC, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated. (Urman, Gary)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that a telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on 6/4/2019 at 03:30 PM before Sara Demers, law clerk for Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Pursuant to Rule 26 (f), counsel are directed to meet and confer at least 21 days prior to the conference scheduled herein to discuss the following matters. It is further ordered that the parties shall file with the Court, on or before May 28, 2019, a joint report reflecting the results of their conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 4/18/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.)(BAR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Watts. (Thompson, Russell)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00111-JGZ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming the Scheduling Conference set before law clerk to Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/4/19, 2019 at 3:30 PM, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form Deadline sent to all parties on this date. (BAC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Loss Prevention Services LLC. (Urman, Gary) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 4/30/2019 (MFR).
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated, Loss Prevention Services LLC, and Regional Acceptance Corporation.(Urman, Gary) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 4/30/2019 (MFR).
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Regional Acceptance Corporation.(Shively, James) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); modified on 4/30/2019 (MFR).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Loss Prevention Services LLC, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16608988. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-111-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stephanie Watts. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16608988 filed by Stephanie Watts. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Regional Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Gary Frank Urman
Represented By: James Edward Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Arizona Repossession Service Incorporated
Represented By: Gary Frank Urman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loss Prevention Services LLC
Represented By: Gary Frank Urman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Watts
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?