Westling v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Linda Westling
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00112
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marcelo Illarmo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Illarmo, Marcelo)
March 15, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is GRANTED, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/6/19. (CKS)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. Within sixty (60) days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff shall file an opening brief in support of his claim that the Administrative Law Judge and Appeals Council erred in finding the Plaintiff was not under a disability. Within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/6/19. (CKS)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-112-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (KAH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Linda Westling. (Miller, Audrey) (KAH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Linda Westling. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Application for leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis) (KAH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Linda Westling. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westling v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Westling
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?