Albert v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Paul Richard Albert
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00153
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christianne Voegele)(Illarmo, Marcelo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Marcelo Illarmo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Beatrice H Na terminated. . (Illarmo, Marcelo)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the motion. (Doc. #15 ). Defendant is granted an extension, to and including 7/1/2019, to file the answer and certified administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 5/28/2019. (MFR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Beatrice Na re: #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Na, Beatrice)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Na, Beatrice)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Beatrice Na appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Na, Beatrice)
April 2, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 3/26/19. (BAC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 3/22/19. (BAC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-153-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Paul Richard Albert. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Richard Albert. (Miller, Meghan) (ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paul Richard Albert. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Beatrice H Na
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Richard Albert
Represented By: Meghan McNamara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?