Ali v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Kawakib Abbas Ali
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00160
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gina Tomaselli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Tomaselli, Gina)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-19-00160-TUC-RM(JR) Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 4/5/2019. (BAR)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00160-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlinesand procedures re Briefing Requirements Contained in LRCiv 16.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 3/25/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.)(BAR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-160-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Kawakib Abbas Ali. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kawakib Abbas Ali. (Miller, Meghan) (ARC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kawakib Abbas Ali. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawakib Abbas Ali
Represented By: Meghan McNamara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?