Warden v. Napier et al
Plaintiff: Roy Warden
Defendant: Mark Napier, Mark Brnovich and Barbara Lawall
Case Number: 4:2019cv00161
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/23/2019. (BAR)
May 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Roy Warden. (Warden, Roy)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of filing this order to file an Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal, without prejudice, if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days. Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney is granted. Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Expedited Rulings on Motion for Proceed IFP and Motion to E-File is granted. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/19/2019. (BAR)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite for Rulings on Motion to Proceed IFP and Motion to E-File by Roy Warden.(3 pages) (BAR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MFR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 *This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0161-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) *Modified to correct case number on 3/29/2019 (MFR).
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Roy Warden. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Roy Warden. (MFR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roy Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warden v. Napier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lawall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?