Greer v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Eric Greer
Defendant: Pima, County of, Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich and Barbara Lawall
Case Number: 4:2019cv00244
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona, State of, Barbara Lawall filed by Eric Greer.(BAR)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Upon a showing of good cause and in the interest of judicial economy, the Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Complaint is hereby GRANTED. (Doc. 9.) Plaintiff Eric Greer will have until on or before Wednesday, July 10, 2019 to file an Amended Complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Raner C Collins.(RCC, bm)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Eric Greer. (BAR)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C. Collins on 5/24/2019. (SSG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION / Request for Assistance of Counsel by Eric Greer. (KEP)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order in compliance with the terms of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, enter a judgment dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 5/8/2019. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C. Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-244-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eric Greer. (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric Greer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lawall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?