Ocean Garden Products Incorporated v. Mayorquin et al

Plaintiff: Ocean Garden Products Incorporated
Defendant: David Mayorquin, ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV and Amanda Lopez Vergara
Case Number: 4:2019cv00284
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Davila
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pacific Ocean Harges, S. De R.L. De C.V. filed by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case (CV-18-322-TUC-RM LEAD CASE) and using the proper event under "LR 42 Motions". Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADAB Ocean Harvest, S. De R.L. De C.V. filed by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case (CV-18-322-TUC-RM LEAD CASE) and using the proper event under "LR 42 Motions". Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 *MOTION to Dismiss Party Pacific Ocean Harges, S. De R.L. De C.V. by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP).
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 *MOTION to Dismiss Party ADAB Ocean Harvest, S. De R.L. De C.V. by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP).
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Amanda Lopez Vergara.(Saffer, Jonathan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING (144) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:18-cv-00322-RM. The above-entitled action shall be consolidated with Case No. 19-cv-00284-FRZ for all motions, discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. The consolidated case will proceed in this Court and all future filings will be made in this case as the lead case. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING 143 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Oppose Dismissal Motion. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to ADAB Ocean Harvest's Motion to Dismiss is extended to 7/12/19. Within 3 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall re-file the Complaint filed on 5/22/19, in Case No. 4:19-cv-00284-FRZ in this case and the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 7/3/19. Discovery due no later than 11/13/19; Dispositive Motions due on or before 12/20/19; A Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due on or before 12/21/19. Unless expressly modified by this Order, all dates and directions to the parties in the original 27 Scheduling Order remain in full force and effect. The parties' 145 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Interrogatories is DENIED AS MOOT, as the parties do not need the Court's approval for such a time extension. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/24/19. (Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00322-RM, 4:19-cv-00284-FRZ) (BAC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases on Consent of all Parties (re-filed per Notice of Deficiency, Doc. 142)) by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint in UFTA Action, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-18-00322-TUC-RM,CV-19-00284-TUC-FRZ) (Mannion, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint in UFTA Action, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-18-00322-TUC-RM,19-CV-00284-TUC-FRZ) (Mannion, David)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the Stipulation (Doc. #13 ) is approved. The date for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including July 1, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 6/10/2019. (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC. (Saffer, Jonathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Marc Saffer on behalf of ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Amanda Lopez Vergara. (Saffer, Jonathan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mannion, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior District Judge Frank R Zapata. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: 19-CV-00284-FRZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Rule 408 Settlement Communications, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order 17-08 and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Checklist upon Abraham Mayorquin on 5/23/2019. (KEP)
May 23, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David M Mannion on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney notified to correct file pro hac motion into master case which has been done. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David M. Mannion by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing (C.D. Cal.), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mannion, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Amanda Lopez Vergara. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16949350. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Davila. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-284-TUC-MSD. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (MCO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16949350 filed by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocean Garden Products Incorporated v. Mayorquin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mayorquin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viviana Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Mayorquin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Lopez Vergara
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne Letzkus
Represented By: Michael John Rusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Garden Products Incorporated
Represented By: David M Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?