Molera v. Nogales, City of et al
Plaintiff: Pedro A Molera
Defendant: Nogales, City of, Roy Bermudez and Frank Felix
Case Number: 4:2019cv00328
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. The following claims are dismissed with prejudice: Count II: Interference with Contract Business Relationship and Business Expectancy; Count III: Breach of Contract; and Count IV: Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED each party shall bear its own fees and costs with respect to the dismissed claims. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/6/2019. (ARC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Roy Bermudez, Frank Felix, Nogales, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(TenBrook, Kylie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts II, III, and IV by Roy Bermudez, Frank Felix, Nogales, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TenBrook, Kylie)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to #9 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : IT IS ORDERED that Defendants City of Nogales and Roy Bermudez shall have until August 5, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/30/2019. (MCO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Roy Bermudez, Nogales, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Roy Bermudez, Frank Felix, Nogales, City of. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #2 Summons Submitted by Plaintiff Pedro A Molera. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Clark, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Exhibits A-F by Plaintiff Pedro A Molera. (Clark, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Pedro A Molera. Document not in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 4. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17076415. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K. Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-328-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Pedro A Molera. (Clark, Douglas) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17076415 filed by Pedro A Molera. (Clark, Douglas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Jury Demand)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molera v. Nogales, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nogales, City of
Represented By: Kylie Crawford TenBrook
Represented By: Stephen Barry Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Bermudez
Represented By: Kylie Crawford TenBrook
Represented By: Stephen Barry Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Felix
Represented By: Kylie Crawford TenBrook
Represented By: Stephen Barry Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro A Molera
Represented By: Douglas H Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Paul Andrew Loucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?