Luque v. Pompeo
Plaintiff: Victor Luque Luque
Defendant: Michael R Pompeo
Case Number: 4:2019cv00330
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Notice (Other). Pursuant to Administrative Policies and Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with event Consent/Election Form LRCiv 3.7(b) located in the Other Documents category. DO NOT REFILE. The deficiency has been addressed by the clerk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Consent/Election Form LRCiv 3.7(b) by Victor Luque Luque . (Romo Vejar, Jesus) Modified on 7/31/2019, incorrect event (BAR).
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent on this date. (BAC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Michael R Pompeo. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Victor Luque Luque. (Romo Vejar, Jesus)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil cover sheet by Plaintiff Victor Luque Luque. (Romo Vejar, Jesus)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Victor Luque Luque. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Victor Luque Luque. Unable to issue summons. Summons must list attorney information on form where indicated. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint / [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Victor Luque Luque. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17076615. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A. Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-330-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Victor Luque Luque. (Romo Vejar, Jesus) (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17076615 filed by Victor Luque Luque. (Romo Vejar, Jesus) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luque v. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Luque Luque
Represented By: Jesus R Romo Vejar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?