Ku Xi-Ra v. Pima County Division of Child Support Services et al
Plaintiff: Njahgemeya Ku Xi-Ra
Defendant: Pima County Superior Court, Michael Trailer, Gary Harrison, Renee T Bennett and Pima County Division of Child Support Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv00355
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's REPLY re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Njahgemeya Ku Xi-Ra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ARC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Renee T Bennett, Gary Harrison, Pima County Division of Child Support Services, Pima County Superior Court, Michael Trailer. (McCright, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Njahgemeya Ku Xi-Ra. (MCO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Renee T Bennett, Gary Harrison, Pima County Division of Child Support Services, Pima County Superior Court, Michael Trailer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(McCright, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to Renee T Bennett, Gary Harrison, Pima County Division of Child Support Services, Pima County Superior Court, and Michael Trailer. (LML) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KEP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number TUC030680. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-355-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TUC030680 filed by Njahgemeya Ku Xi-Ra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ku Xi-Ra v. Pima County Division of Child Support Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Superior Court
Represented By: Robert Richard McCright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trailer
Represented By: Robert Richard McCright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Harrison
Represented By: Robert Richard McCright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee T Bennett
Represented By: Robert Richard McCright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Division of Child Support Services
Represented By: Robert Richard McCright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Njahgemeya Ku Xi-Ra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?