Tucson Medical Center v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Plaintiff: Tucson Medical Center
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP, Abbott Laboratories, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Anda Incorporated, Allergan PLC, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated, Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Cephalon Incorporated, H.D. Smith LLC, Henry Schein Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Depomed Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Abbott Laboratories Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Specgx LLC, Noramco Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, CVS Pharmacies, CVS Health Corporation and CVS Arizona LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00358
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. That the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order Designated as "CTO-105" filed on July 31, 2019, is VACATED. (MAP)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and For Sanctions (Doc. #1 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The request for remand is granted. The request for sanctions is denied. This case shall be remanded to the Superior Court of Pima County, Arizona. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close the Court's file in this matter. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Raner C Collins. (MCO)
August 5, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anda Incorporated. (Hall, Carlyle)
August 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Katy E Koski, James W Matthews, and Ana M Francisco on behalf of Anda Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Noramco Incorporated. (Sperling, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Johnston, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Endo International, plc for Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Jackson, G)
July 31, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for John P McDonald on behalf of Henry Schein Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Sancttions MOTION to Expedite Tucson Medical Center's Emergency Motion to Remand filed by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Transcript, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Email, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Insys MTD Below, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Insys Joining All Manufacturer Defendants MTD Below, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Indefinite Delay, #6 Exhibit Ex F - "Its like people are addicted to these things or something. Oh, wait, people are...", #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Compliance with the law is a "business" decision, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Knowledge of Child Addiction)(Mitchell, Samuel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gerald M. Abdalla. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Forward. Document number 11. (BAR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Henry Schein Incorporated. (Weisman, Adam)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the Honorable Raner C. Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/30/19. (CKS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Stein, Lee)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allergan PLC. (Stein, Lee)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.D. Smith LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith LLC. (Kastner, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Kastner, John)
July 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Samuel Mitchell and John W Barrett on behalf of plaintiff Tucson Medical Center, granted for Daniel Jarcho for defendant Noramco Incorporated, and granted for Kathleen Matsoukas and William Edward Padgett on behalf of HD Smith LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Stillwell, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated. (Davis, Gregory)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates Incorporated for Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated. (Benveniste, Katherine)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #1 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Sancttions MOTION to Expedite Tucson Medical Center's Emergency Motion to Remand filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Gregory)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Defendants' Notice of Pending Motions by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and for Sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's motion (Doc. #1 ) on or before July 26, 2019. Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/18/2019. (DLC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata re: #2 Notice of Removal by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated.. (Davis, Gregory)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Tucson Medical Center's Notice of Related Action by Tucson Medical Center . (Mitchell, Steven)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and For Sanctions by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - LRCiv 3.6(c) Notice, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Pima County Superior Court Minute Entry Taking Motions Under Advisement)(Mitchell, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Incorporated, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Anda Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Depomed Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, H.D. Smith LLC, Henry Schein Incorporated, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Noramco Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP, Specgx LLC, Tucson Medical Center. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Sancttions, MOTION to Expedite Tucson Medical Center's Emergency Motion to Remand by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Mitchell, Steven)
July 15, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED of Original Complaint: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, H.D. Smith LLC, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated and Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/15/2018); Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Allergan PLC, Actavis LLC, Cephalon Incorporated, Anda Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated and Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/17/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated on 10/10/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/18/2018); Amended Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Abbott Laboratories, Purdue Pharma LP, Henry Schein Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated and Abbott Laboratories Incorporated on 10/10/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/18/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Specgx LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC and Mallinckrodt PLC on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/19/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Depomed Incorporated and Noramco Incorporated on 10/15/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/23/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Purdue Pharma Incorporated and Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/23/2018.)(KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17164382. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-358-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (KAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20184991. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17164382 filed by Specgx LLC, Cephalon Incorporated, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, Actavis LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Noramco Incorporated. (Davis, Gregory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E part 1, #8 Exhibit E part 2, #9 Exhibit E part 3, #10 Exhibit E part 4, #11 Exhibit E part 5, #12 Exhibit E part 6, #13 Exhibit E part 7, #14 Exhibit E part 8, #15 Exhibit E part 9, #16 Exhibit E part 10, #17 Exhibit E part 11, #18 Exhibit E part 12, #19 Exhibit E part 13, #20 Exhibit E part 14, #21 Exhibit E part 15, #22 Exhibit E part 16, #23 Exhibit E part 17, #24 Exhibit E part 18, #25 Exhibit E part 19, #26 Exhibit E part 20, #27 Exhibit F)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson Medical Center v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: David L Curl
Represented By: John A McCauley
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Rocky C Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Incorporated
Represented By: Carlyle Washington Hall, III
Represented By: Michelle Marie Buckley
Represented By: Katy E Koski
Represented By: Ana Maria Francisco
Represented By: James W Matthews
Represented By: Ana M Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Lee David Stein
Represented By: Donna Welch
Represented By: Jennifer G Levy
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary Ciullo
Represented By: Maria Pellegrino Rivera
Represented By: Martin L Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Schulman
Represented By: Joseph L Franco
Represented By: J Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Michael Stephen Myers
Represented By: Ian Ormsby Bucon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Collie F James
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Richard Michael Amoroso
Represented By: Gregory Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Klarfeld
Represented By: David Calvin Potts
Represented By: Paul J Cosgrove
Represented By: Jeremy C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Incorporated
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Collie F James
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Richard Michael Amoroso
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Gregory Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: John James Kastner, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen L Matsoukas
Represented By: William E Padgett
Represented By: William Edward Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Incorporated
Represented By: John P McDonald
Represented By: Lauren M Fincher
Represented By: C Scott Jones
Represented By: Adam Weisman
Represented By: Brandan J Montminy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Represented By: Sina S Aria
Represented By: Steve Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda Christine Sheridan
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Victoria Marie Dunne
Represented By: Jake R Miller
Represented By: Jean Ann Roof
Represented By: John D Lombardo
Represented By: G Todd Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Collie F James
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Richard Michael Amoroso
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Gregory Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Moomjian, II
Represented By: David T Arlington
Represented By: Kevin M Sadler
Represented By: Scott D Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Represented By: Sina S Aria
Represented By: Steve Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Incorporated
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Collie F James
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Richard Michael Amoroso
Represented By: Gregory Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda Christine Sheridan
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Victoria Marie Dunne
Represented By: Jake R Miller
Represented By: Jean Ann Roof
Represented By: John D Lombardo
Represented By: G Todd Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Incorporated
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Collie F James
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Richard Michael Amoroso
Represented By: Gregory Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Incorporated
Represented By: Karen Johnson Stillwell
Represented By: Daniel J O'Connor
Represented By: Ashley W Hardin
Represented By: A Joshua Podoll
Represented By: Miranda Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: John James Kastner, Jr.
Represented By: Steven James Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Incorporated
Represented By: David L Curl
Represented By: John A McCauley
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Represented By: Sina S Aria
Represented By: Steve Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Rocky C Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sperling
Represented By: Cari K Dawson
Represented By: Daniel G Jarcho
Represented By: Jenny A Mendelsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Represented By: Sina S Aria
Represented By: Steve Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Arizona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Medical Center
Represented By: John W Don Barrett
Represented By: George Robert Blakey
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven C Mitchell
Represented By: Gerald M Abdalla
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: Yifei Li
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Steven A Martino
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Ruth Roberts Lichtenfeld
Represented By: Jonathan W Cuneo
Represented By: Monica Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?