Wilkerson v. LaWall et al
Plaintiff: Lola Wilkerson
Defendant: Chris Mangus, Victoria Otto and Barbara LaWall
Case Number: 4:2019cv00360
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #22 Supplement, #21 MOTION for Leave to File for Permission to Submit Evidence in Audio Form and DVD Form by Chris Mangus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Renee)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 Evidence Submission of Deprivation of Rights under the Color of Law and Evidence to Substantiate Factual Allegations to Support Denial of Dismissals by Plaintiff Lola Wilkerson. (22 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAR)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Submit Evidence in Audio Form and DVD Form by Lola Wilkerson. (1 page) (BAR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Submission of Restatement to Replies for Dismissal Motions by Defendants Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto, Chris Magnus by Lola Wilkerson. (6 pages) (BAR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Submission to Deny Amended Complaint by Barbara LaWall et., al., by Plaintiff Lola Wilkerson. (7 pages) (BAR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Submission of Statement to the Reply for Denial of Dismissal for Defendants Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto, Chris Magnus by Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto. (Roubicek, Laura)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims Amended Complaint by Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto. (Roubicek, Laura)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT to the #15 , #14 Reply for Denial of Dismissal for Defendants Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto, Chris Magnus by Plaintiff Lola Wilkerson. (6 pages) (BAR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to #13 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto. (Roubicek, Laura) *Modified to correct document linkage on 8/5/2019 (KAH).
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY re: #11 Response to #6 Motion by Defendant Chris Mangus. (Waters, Renee) *Modified on 8/5/2019 to add document linkage (KAH).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal/Motion to Dismiss Defendants Barbara LaWall and Victoira Otto by Plaintiff Lola Wilkerson. (3 pages) (BAR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Provide Pro Bono Attorney if Available by Lola Wilkerson. (2 pages) (BAR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Chris Magnus filed by Lola Wilkerson. (3 pages) (BAR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal by Lola Wilkerson. (12 pages) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(BAR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lola Wilkerson. (BAR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Lola Wilkerson. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Chris Mangus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Waters, Renee)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Notice of Pending Motion by Barbara LaWall, Victoria Otto . (Roubicek, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17167676. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-360-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20193114. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17167676 filed by Chris Mangus. (Waters, Renee) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)
July 16, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule 102(A) FASTAR Certificate upon Barbara LaWall; Victoria Otto on 6/26/2019. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 7/3/2019); Upon Chris Mangus on 6/26/2019. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 7/9/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. LaWall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Mangus
Represented By: Renee Jeanette Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Otto
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara LaWall
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?