Monroy v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Luis Monroy
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00363
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: NOTICE TO PARTIES that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. In addition, parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filed prior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/30/2019. (MFR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Luis Monroy: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/19/2019 to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company . (Kirschner, Barry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Luis Monroy. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17166228. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-363-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17166228 filed by Luis Monroy. (Kirschner, Barry) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroy v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Monroy
Represented By: Barry Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?