C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated v. Osman Produce LLC
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated
Defendant: Osman Produce LLC and Oscar Villa
Case Number: 4:2019cv00372
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Osman Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Kimberly)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER pursuant to #13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Osman Produce, LLC shall Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before 9/14/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 8/29/19.(BAC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Osman Produce LLC, Oscar Villa. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Kimberly)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Celene Soto on behalf of Osman Produce LLC, Oscar Villa. (Soto, Kimberly)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 16, 2019 to Defendant Oscar Villa and Endorsed on August 16, 2019. (Amendola, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent on this date. (BAC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint and All Court Notices upon Defendant Osman Produce, LLC on July 25, 2019. (Amendola, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Mark A Amendola on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type; Attorney information is not reflected on the first page of the Complaint. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Osman Produce LLC, Oscar Villa. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17192448. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00372-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated. (BAC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17192448 filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated. (Amendola, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Statement of Account and Unpaid Invoices)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated v. Osman Produce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osman Produce LLC
Represented By: Steven J Itkin
Represented By: Kimberly Celene Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Villa
Represented By: Steven J Itkin
Represented By: Kimberly Celene Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide Incorporated
Represented By: Mark A Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?