Minta v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Minta
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company, Paul Revere Life Insurance Company and Unum Group
Case Number: 4:2019cv00376
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER the Defendant shall have until and including September 24, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/11/2019. (DLC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (First Request) by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reich, Adam)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New York Life Insurance Company filed by Michelle Minta.(Richards, Clayton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Michelle Minta . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richards, Clayton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Michelle Minta. Party Paul Revere Life Insurance Company (a Massachusetts Corporation ) and Unum Group (a Delaware Corporation) terminated. (Richards, Clayton)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Minta: Affidavit of Service re: Summons (Doc. 5-1); Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (Doc. 3); Notice re: MIDP (Doc. 4); Civil Coversheet (Doc. 1-1) upon The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company on August 1, 2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Minta: Affidavit of Service re: Summons (Doc. 5); Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (Doc. 3); Notice re: MIDP (Doc. 4); Civil Coversheet (Doc. 1-1) upon New York Life Insurance Company on August 1, 2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New York Life Insurance Company, Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17197520. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frank R Zapata. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0376-TUC-FRZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michelle Minta. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17197520 filed by Michelle Minta. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minta v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Thomas Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Minta
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Patrick W Mause
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?