Lackey v. Pima County Jail
Plaintiff: John D Lackey
Defendant: Pima County Jail, Mark Napier, Pima County Sheriff's Department and Pima, County of
Case Number: 4:2019cv00406
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John D Lackey. (2 pages) (DLC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John D Lackey. (2 pages) (DLC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pima County, Pima County Sheriff Department and Mark Napier filed by John D Lackey. (10 pages)(DLC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Plaintiff's "Motion of True Facts Against Retaliation on Plaintiff" (Doc. #5 ), to the extent that it seeks any relief, is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Indigent Legal Supplies/Court Order (Doc. #6 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to pay the filing and administrative fees for this action or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and file an amended complaint in compliance with the August 27, 2019 Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the Order, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 10/02/2019. (DLC)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Indigent Legal Supplies/Court Order by John D Lackey. (1 page) (DLC)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION of True Facts Against Retaliation on Plaintiff by John D Lackey. (3 pages) (DLC)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal of this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to file on the court-approved form. If Plaintiff fails to file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order, the Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal of this action. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/27/2019. (MCO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Attestment for Factual Basis by John D Lackey. (2 pages) (BAR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by John D Lackey. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey v. Pima County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?