Gila River Indian Community v. Cranford et al
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Defendant: Eva Schoebroek, Joyce Cranford, Donna Sexton, David Schoebroek, Marvin Sexton and Patrick Sexton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00407
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Abstain by Joyce Cranford, David Schoebroek, Eva Schoebroek, Donna Sexton, Marvin Sexton, Patrick Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vasta, Mario)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint with Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon Eva Schoebroek on 09/05/2019. (Godfrey, Merrill)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint with Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon David Schoebroek on 09/05/2019. (Godfrey, Merrill)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until September 26, 2019 to for Defendants respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/5/19. (MAW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by Joyce Cranford, David Schoebroek, Eva Schoebroek, Donna Sexton, Marvin Sexton, Patrick Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Kevin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint and Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon Patrick Sexton on 8/18/2018. (Godfrey, Merrill) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number on 8/22/2019 (MCO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint with Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon Marvin Sexton on 08/17/2019. (Godfrey, Merrill) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number on 8/22/2019 (MCO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint with Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon Donna Sexton on 8/17/2019. (Godfrey, Merrill) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number on 8/22/2019 (MCO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: summons, complaint with Exhibit A, civil cover sheet, MIDP notice upon Joyce Cranford on 8/17/2019. (Godfrey, Merrill) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number on 8/22/2019 (MCO).
August 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Donald R Pongrace, Merrill C Godfrey on behalf of Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joyce Cranford, David Schoebroek, Eva Schoebroek, Donna Sexton, Marvin Sexton, Patrick Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17280500. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-407-TUC-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(KEP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17280500 filed by Gila River Indian Community. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gila River Indian Community v. Cranford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Schoebroek
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Cranford
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sexton
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schoebroek
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Sexton
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Sexton
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Lauren James Caster
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: Donald R Pongrace
Represented By: Merrill C Godfrey
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Represented By: Jason Travis Hauter
Represented By: Linus Everling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?