Ibarra v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Eric Ibarra
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Arizona Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2019cv00447
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Ibarra. Reason for return: Return to Sender/No Such Number/Unable to Forward. Document number 7. (MCO)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Ibarra #248867. Reason for return: No Such Number. Document number 2. (DLC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Ibarra. (1 (page) (DLC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 PETITIONER'S MOTION for an Update on Status of this Case by Eric Ibarra. (2 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DLC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number TUC031142. (DLC)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay or file a complete Application within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/15/2019. (DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Ibarra #248867. Reason for return: Return to Sender- Unable to Forward. Document number 2. (DLC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Ibarra #248867. Reason for return: Return to Sender - No Such Number. Document number 4. (DLC)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/17/2019. (DLC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Ibarra #248867. Reason for return: No Such Street. Document number 2, the Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form with it instructions, court addressed envelope, and Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2. (DLC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Eric Ibarra. (202 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibarra v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?