Ramirez et al v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Karen Sanchez Ramirez and Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera
Respondent: William Barr, Kevin McAleenan and Albert Carter
Case Number: 4:2019cv00455
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman (PS)
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. (Ayala, Siovhan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by William Barr, Albert Carter, Kevin McAleenan.(Solomon, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Order upon William Barr, U.S. Attorney General served 9/17/2019 and Albert Carter, ICE Phoenix Field Office, served 9/18/2019. (BAR)
September 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of Petitioner Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Pro hac vice motion correctly filed into master case and $100 filing fee paid. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sarah T. Gillman by Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. (Gillman, Sarah)
September 13, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gregory Paul Copeland on behalf of Petitioner Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Petitioner Karen Sanchez Ramirez is dismissed without prejudice. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). Petitioner Ramirez-Herrera shall have 14 days from the filing of Respondents' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Reply. The Clerk of Court shall promptly serve: (i) a copy of the Summons, (ii) the Petition (Doc. 1), (iii) the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 2), and (iv) this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and this Order to the U.S. Attorney General and to Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall email a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/13/2019. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera.(Ayala, Siovhan) *Modified to correct event type on 9/13/2019 (KEP).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera: Certificate of Service re: Habeas, Motion for TRO and PI, Memo re TRO and PI, Exhibits upon William Barr, Albert Carter, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney's Office on 09/11/2019. (Ayala, Siovhan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. (Ayala, Siovhan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. (Ayala, Siovhan) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17386356 filed by Karen Sanchez Ramirez, Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera. (Ayala, Siovhan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Sanchez Ramirez
Represented By: Gregory P Copeland
Represented By: Sarah T Gillman
Represented By: Siovhan Sheridan Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elsa Leticia Ramirez-Herrera
Represented By: Gregory P Copeland
Represented By: Sarah T Gillman
Represented By: Siovhan Sheridan Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Albert Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?