Black-Hurley v. Life Care Centers of America Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Black-Hurley
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Life Care Centers of America Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00514
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Case transferred in from Phoenix Division on 10/25/2019. Case Number CV-19-5428-PHX-JJT. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-514-TUC-LCK. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Within the four corners of the Complaint, Plaintiff does not allege any fact connecting this action with the region covered by the Phoenix division of the District of Arizona. Based on this finding, the Court exercises its discretion under LRCiv 5.1(a) to assign this case to the Tucson division of the District of Arizona, as Defendant requests in the Notice of Removal. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the Tucson division as soon as is practicable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for December 9, 2019. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/24/2019. (SST)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/21/19. (JAMA)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Motions to dismiss and motions to strike that do not contain the required certification are subject to striking on the Court's own motion. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/21/19. (JAMA)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Care Centers of America Incorporated. (San Angelo, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Life Care Centers of America Incorporated. (DLC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Life Care Centers of America Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17529791. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5428-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
October 18, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Life Care Centers of America Incorporated. (Original filed in state court (Maricopa Superior Court) on 10/8/2019.(DLC)
October 18, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement, Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery to Defendants, Disc with Initial Disclosure Statement upon Life Care of America Incorporated dba Life care Center of Tucson on 09/18/2019. (Original filed in state court (Maricopa Superior Court) on 9/25/2019). (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-010421. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17529791 filed by Life Care Centers of America Incorporated.(San Angelo, Melissa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black-Hurley v. Life Care Centers of America Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Incorporated
Represented By: James William Kaucher
Represented By: Melissa Sue San Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Black-Hurley
Represented By: Brendan James Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?