Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers et al v. Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System et al
Plaintiff: Sunset Community Health Center, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Marana Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Native Health and Mariposa Community Health Center
Defendant: Jami Snyder and Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Case Number: 4:2019cv00517
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System. (Johnston, Logan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Freedus, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend their Motion to Dismiss. The Court will accept the Parties stipulation under LRCiv 12.1(c) that the Parties agree that no disputed issue in the pleadings is curable by amendment. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 12/13/2019. (ARC)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline (Doc. #21 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before December 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 12/9/2019. (MCO)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Add Certification Under Local Rule 12.1(c) by Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Logan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation for Extension of Time)(Laue, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion for an Extension and Limited Discovery. Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 12/4/2019. (KEP)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Leave to Take Limited, Expedited Discovery (First Request) by Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Logan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System, Jami Snyder . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alaska state plan excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Arizona state plan excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - California state plan excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Hawaii state plan excerpt, #5 Exhibit E - Idaho state plan excerpt, #6 Exhibit F - Montana state plan excerpt, #7 Exhibit G - Nevada state plan excerpt, #8 Exhibit H - Oregon state plan excerpt, #9 Exhibit I - Washington state plan excerpt)(Johnston, Logan) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number. Modified to reflect correct filers on 11/26/2019 (ARC).
November 20, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorney Nori Ali removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corp. Disclosure, Consent of Jurisdiction, Notice to Parties MIDP, Civil Cover Sheet upon Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System on November 07, 2019. (Laue, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corp. Disclosure, Consent of Jurisdiction, Notice to Parties MIDP, Civil Cover Sheet upon Jami Snyder on November 06, 2019. (Laue, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Office of the Attorney General on behalf of Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System. (LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed the Page Limit by thirteen (13) pages (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 10/30/2019. (MCO)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System. (LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #11 Declaration by Plaintiff Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Freedus, Matthew) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case caption/case number on 10/30/2019 (MCO).
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 *DECLARATION of Clinton G. Kuntz re: #9 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Freedus, Matthew) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case caption/case number on 10/30/2019 (MCO).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Laue, Thomas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 *First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers. (Freedus, Matthew) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case caption/case number on 10/30/2019 (MCO).
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Laue, Thomas)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filedprior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 10/28/2019. (MCO)
October 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew S Freedus and Derek M Adams on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, and United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limit by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sun Life Family Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laue, Thomas) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case caption/case number on 10/30/2019 (MCO).
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Sun Life Family Health Center. (KEP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17562488. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-517-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Canyonlands Healthcare, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Marana Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center, Mountain Park Health Center, Native Health, North Country Healthcare, Sunset Community Health Center, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora. (Laue, Thomas) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Corporate Disclosure, #5 Corporate Disclosure, #6 Corporate Disclosure, #7 Corporate Disclosure, #8 Corporate Disclosure, #9 Corporate Disclosure, #10 Corporate Disclosure)(KEP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17562488 filed by Marana Health Center, Sunset Community Health Center, Chiricahua Community Health Centers, Mountain Park Health Center, North Country Healthcare, United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora, Canyonlands Healthcare, Native Health, Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers, Desert Senita Community Health Center, Sun Life Family Health Center, Mariposa Community Health Center. (Laue, Thomas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers et al v. Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Community Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Country Healthcare
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Life Family Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Community Health Center-Maria Auxiliadora
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiricahua Community Health Centers
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marana Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Park Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Senita Community Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Alliance For Community Health Centers
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canyonlands Healthcare
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Health
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariposa Community Health Center
Represented By: Noori F Ali
Represented By: Derek M Adams
Represented By: Matthew S Freedus
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Snyder
Represented By: Logan T Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Represented By: Logan T Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?