Cannon et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Marianne Cannon and Hiram Cannon
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00016
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that a Case Management Conference is set for March 17, 2020 at 10:10 AM. A party may appear telephonically by contacting chambers or by including the information in the Joint Case Management Report on or before Friday, March 13, 2020. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least twenty-one (21) days before the Case Management Conference. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report with the Court no later than four (4) days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 02/14/20. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Hiram Cannon. (Arrotta, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B Arrotta on behalf of Hiram Cannon. (Arrotta, Richard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Nafisi, Arman)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17817631. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-16-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Nafisi, Arman) (MYE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20196286. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17817631 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Nafisi, Arman) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Cannon
Represented By: William D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram Cannon
Represented By: William D Nelson
Represented By: Richard B Arrotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Arman Robert Nafisi
Represented By: Brian Thomas DelGatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?