Argraves v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Randy Lynn Argraves
Defendant: Bank of America NA, Unknown Parties and Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00063
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:, Motions terminated: Discovery due 9/8/2020; Dispositive motions due 10/6/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due 10/6/2020; Joint Settlement Status Report due 7/13/2020, and every 90 days thereafter. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/27/20. (BAC)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 As part of a larger effort to respond to the public health crisis of COVID-19, IT IS ORDERED that the Case Management conference is reset to a telephonic conference on March 27, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Jennifer Stone, law clerk to the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. To connect to the call, counsel are directed to follow the instructions previously emailed to them by the law clerk. No time or date change. Ordered by Judge Jennifer G Zipps. (SKM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Report filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Henson, Courtney)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that the Case Management Conference is RESET for 3/27/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jennifer G Zipps. As previously stated, if the Parties would like to appear telephonically, they may do so by contacting chambers before March 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 03/03/20. (MYE)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Jennifer G Zipps. The parties are directed to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., for the objectives of the conference. The parties are directed to confer at least 21 days before the conference. Joint Report due by 3/19/2020. All parties are expected to comply with Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. P., and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/26/20. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America NA identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America NA. (Henson, Courtney)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 DEFENDANT MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Holtzman, Barney)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Minnesota Life Insurance Company answer due 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/18/20. (KAH)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 Bank of America's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Bank of America NA.(Henson, Courtney)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation for Extension for Minnesota Life Insurance Co. to File an Answer)(Holtzman, Barney)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Holtzman, Barney)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/5/2020. (MFR)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bank of America NA, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (MCO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17920850. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-63-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 5, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Rule 102(A) FASTAR Certificate upon Minnesota Life Insurance Company, a Minnesota Corporation, by Service upon AZ Dept of Insurance served Maria Salinas on 1/8/2020. Upon Bank of America, National Association, a National Association by Service upon its Statutory Agent, CT Corporation System served Scott Whaley on 1/9/2020. (originals were filed 1/9/2020 and 1/13/2020) (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number CV20196385. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17920850 filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Holtzman, Barney) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argraves v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lynn Argraves
Represented By: Burton J Kinerk
Represented By: Christopher S McDonagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Courtney Leigh Henson
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Barney Myer Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?