Lowrey v. Poly Print Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Lowrey
Defendant: Poly Print Incorporated, Ron Genova and Joe Genova
Case Number: 4:2020cv00135
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Referring Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings in this case shall be designated, as follows: CV 20-135-TUC DCB (DTF). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall note that the initials in the case caption are extremely important because they determine routing to the proper court of all documents filed in this action. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 5/15/20. (MYE)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Joseph Lowrey by Joe Genova, Ron Genova, Poly Print Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cope, Thom)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, David C Bury. All future documents filed shall reflect the following case number: CV-20-135-TUC-DCB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Election Form resent x3 on this date. (DLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Genova, Ron Genova, Poly Print Incorporated. (Cope, Thom) *Modified to add attorney on 4/23/2020 (MYE).
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. (REC)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Joseph Lowrey: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 17, 2020 to Thom Cope, attorney for Poly Print Incorporated . (Foster, Troy) *Modified docket text to reflect correct party served on 4/21/2020 (MYE).
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendant Poly Print Incorporated. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Joseph Lowrey. (Foster, Troy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent x2 on this date. (BAC)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Summons Submitted filed by Joseph Lowrey. Document not in compliance with Rule 4 of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Only one defendant per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Joseph Lowrey. (Foster, Troy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18117423. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-135-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18117423 filed by Joseph Lowrey. (Foster, Troy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowrey v. Poly Print Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poly Print Incorporated
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Guadalupe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Genova
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Guadalupe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Genova
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Guadalupe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lowrey
Represented By: Megan Nicole Weides
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?