RMJak Properties LP v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Plaintiff: RMJak Properties LP
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00137
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by RMJak Properties LP. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Notice of Issuance of Subpoena by RMJak Properties LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Nicholas)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This case is subject to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (MIDP) implemented by General Order 17-08. Discovery due by 1/13/2021. Dispositive motions due by 2/19/2021. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/15/2021. Joint Settlement Status Report due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 5/15/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by RMJak Properties LP. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Proposed Case Management Plan filed by Plaintiff RMJak Properties LP. (Smith, Nicholas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Werner, Rachel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff RMJak Properties LP. (Smith, Nicholas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re: of Related Cases by AmGUARD Insurance Company . (Kleiner, Matthew)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company for AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Kleiner, Matthew)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference is set for May 11, 2020, at 11:00, before Joseph Falcon-Freeman, law clerk to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file with the Court, on or before May 4, 2020, a Joint Report. All parties are expected to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/30/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AmGUARD Insurance Company. (ARC)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18117354. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-137-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 26, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** ANSWER to Amended Complaint by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 1/10/2020) ***ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(ARC)
March 26, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint, Rule 102(A) FASTAR Certificate, Demand for Jury Trial upon AmGUARD Insurance Company on 11/27/2019.(Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 12/17/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. Modified to correct documents served on 3/27/2020 (ARC).
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20195626. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18117354 filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Kleiner, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RMJak Properties LP v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Rachel Leigh Werner
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Kleiner
Represented By: Annelise Mari Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMJak Properties LP
Represented By: Nicholas Gardner Smith
Represented By: Michael John Ponzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?