Pfaendler v. Sahuarita, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler
Defendant: Sahuarita, Town of, Samuel Almodova, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Shannon Collier and Jess Villanueva
Case Number: 4:2020cv00188
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: John C Hinderaker
2 Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Samuel Almodova, Shannon Collier, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Sahuarita, Town of, Jess Villanueva. (Jellison, James)
January 4, 2021 Filing 27 *MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint #1 by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wintory, Richard) *Modified on 1/5/2021, to correct reference to related document. (MCO).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER: granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within the time provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Review attached order for details). Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 12/17/2020. (MCO)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 *AMENDED at Doc. 26 - ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within the time provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/17/2020. (MCO) Modified on 12/18/2020 (MCO).
November 5, 2020 Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge John C Hinderaker. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV 20-188-JCH.
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Samuel Almodova, Shannon Collier, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Sahuarita, Town of, Jess Villanueva. (Jellison, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Wintory, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension until August 21, 2020 for Plaintiff to file a Response to the Sahuarita Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Second Request) (Doc. #21 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/18/2020. (MCO)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Sahuarita Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Second Request) Doc. #18 by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wintory, Richard) *Modified on 8/18/2020, to correct reference to related document. (MCO).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time (Doc. #19 ) until August 14, 2020 for Plaintiff to file a response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/7/2020. (MCO)
August 7, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiff's Time to File a Response to Sahuarita Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (First Request) by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wintory, Richard)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Samuel Almodova, Shannon Collier, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Sahuarita, Town of, Jess Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jellison, James)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Defendant John George as until 7/27/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/2/2020. (MCO)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint #1 by John George. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jellison, James) *Modified on 7/2/2020, to correct reference to related document. (MCO).
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Jellison on behalf of Samuel Almodova, Shannon Collier, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Sahuarita, Town of, Jess Villanueva. (Jellison, James)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 28, 2020 to Town of Sahuarita . (Wintory, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 28, 2020 to Shannon Collier . (Wintory, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 28, 2020 to Samuel Almodova . (Wintory, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 28, 2020 to Joseph A. Rivera . (Wintory, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 28, 2020 to Jess Villanueva . (Wintory, Richard)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler: Certificate of Service re: Complaint upon John George on 5/28/2020. (MCO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Samuel Almodova, Shannon Collier, John George, Joseph A Rivera, Sahuarita, Town of, Jess Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiff must either serve each Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each Defendant. If Plaintiff does not comply within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Defendants must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot pursuant to General Order 17-08. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/5/2020. (REVIEW ORDER FOR DETAILS) (MCO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The parties are advised that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. In addition, parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filed prior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order. (REVIEW Notice for complete details) (MCO)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC) *Modified on 5/4/2020 to correct signature date (DLC).
May 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Wintory, Richard)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 (AMENDED BY DOC. #5 )--NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC) Modified on 5/4/2020 (DLC).
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18237385 filed by Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler. (Wintory, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfaendler v. Sahuarita, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahuarita, Town of
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Almodova
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John George
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Rivera
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Collier
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Villanueva
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Christopher Austin Pfaendler
Represented By: Richard Mendel Wintory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?