Rowe v. Von Blankensee
Petitioner: Cory M Rowe
Respondent: Unknown Von Blankensee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00224
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins (PS)
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 *NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action (Joint Notice of Withdrawal by Unknown Von Blankensee re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)) . (Kroeger, Melissa) *Modified to correct event type on 7/13/2020 (MYE).
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Unknown Von Blankensee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Melissa)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Consent form, and Order upon U.S. Attorney on 6/19/20. Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, and Order upon Warden of USP-Tucson on 6/23/20. (MYE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Order upon U.S. Attorney General on 6/22/20. (MYE)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Cory M Rowe. Reason for return: No longer at this address. Document number 5, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form with instructions, court addressed envelope, and Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2. (MYE)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc. 1), the Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction form and instructions, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General and to Respondent. Respondent Unknown Von Blanckensee must answer the Petition within 20 days of the date of service. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lynnette C. Kimmins pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction form, #3 Instructions, #4 Summons)(MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Attachment(IFP, to include case number) to Main Document re: #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (BAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Attachment(Petition, to include case number) to Main Document re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). (BAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Unknown Von Blankensee. (2 pages). (BAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Cory M Rowe. (14 pages). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 envelope)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Von Blankensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Von Blankensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cory M Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?