Forrest v. Rardin
Petitioner: Ryan Patrick Forrest
Respondent: Jared Rardin
Case Number: 4:2020cv00225
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro (PS)
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Comply (Doc. #10 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/22/20. (MYE)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Order Concerning Court Access by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (1 page) (MYE)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 Service Returned Unexecuted : Summons, Petition, Order as to Jared Rardin. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Consent form/instructions, and Order upon U.S. Attorney's Office Attn: Civil Process Clerk on 7/13/20. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Comply by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (1 page) (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge Scott H. Rash. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV 20-225-SHR.
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc. 1), the Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction form and instructions, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General and to Respondent. Respondent Jared Rardin must answer the Petition within 20 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/9/20. (MYE)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC032154. (MYE)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 is denied. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/15/20. (MYE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (2 pages) (MYE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (2 pages) (MYE)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/1/20. (MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (9 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forrest v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jared Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Patrick Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?