Chaney v. Von Blanckensee
Petitioner: Steven Christopher Chaney
Respondent: Unknown Von Blanckensee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00230
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera (PS)
Referring Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that Petitioner's Notice (Doc. #8 ), to the extent that it seeks any relief, is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/24/20. (MYE)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Emergency Motion by Steven Christopher Chaney. (1 page) (DLC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed July 16, 2020, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U. S. C. 2241 is denied and this case is dismissed. (DLC)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed. Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 2241 Pursuant to Circuit Rule 27-3 (Doc. #3 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/16/2020. (DLC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 2241 Pursuant to Circuit Rule 27-3 by Steven Christopher Chaney. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Steven Christopher Chaney. (2 pages) (MYE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Steven Christopher Chaney. (23 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney v. Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Christopher Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?