Pinson et al v. Von Blanckensee
Petitioner: Jimmy Malone, Jonah Garza, Edwin Wike, Bobby Sunday, Eric Ontiveros, Jeremy Pinson, Coty Travis Waters, Tyrelle Lockett, Rene Ellis, Ian Gordon, Tyree Yellow Elk, Clifford See Walker, Anthony Bennett, Shavn Knox, Derek Lecompte, Matthew Middleton, Jahmal Green, Matthew McLean, Scott Young, Ryan Patrick Forrest, Shaun Knox and Montavis D Middleton
Respondent: Barbara Von Blanckensee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00237
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau (PS)
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 27 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER of USCA re: #25 Notice of Appeal. (Copies sent by Ninth Circuit.) (KAH)
July 24, 2020 Filing 26 USCA Case Number re: #25 Notice of Appeal. Case number 20-16422, 9th CCA.(Copies sent by Ninth Circuit.) (KAH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #24 Order, #4 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Clerks Judgment by Tyree Yellow Elk, Rene Ellis, Ryan Patrick Forrest, Shaun Knox, Jimmy Malone, Montavis D Middleton, Eric Ontiveros, Jeremy Pinson, Coty Travis Waters, Edwin Wike, Scott Young. (1 page) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KAH)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER The Emergency Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. #22 ) is denied. The Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #9 ), three Motions for Appointment of Counsel (Docs. #11 , #14 , and #15 ), and the Emergency Motion to Intervene, for Joinder, Class Certification, and Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #20 ) are denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 7/10/2020. (See attached Order for complete details) (DLC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC032155. (DLC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: #4 Order Dismissing Case by Jeremy Pinson. (3 pages) (DLC)
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Wike) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 EMERGENCY MOTION to Intervene, MOTION for Joinder, Class Certification and MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Rene Ellis, Ryan Patrick Forrest, Jahmal Green, Eric Ontiveros, Jeremy Pinson, Coty Travis Waters, Scott Young. (19 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DLC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 *Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. (McLean) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) *Modified to add filer on 6/18/2020 (MYE).
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Pinson) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Jiggetts) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. (LeCompte) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tyree Yellow Elk, Shaun Knox. (1 page) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLC)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Coty Travis Waters, Edwin Wike. (1 page) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLC)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 *Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Gordon) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) *Modified to indicate duplicate entry of doc 12 on 6/11/2020 (CEI).
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Gordon) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Notice of Assignment) by Ryan Patrick Forrest. (3 pages) (DLC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shaun Knox. (2 pages) (DLC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shaun Knox. (2 pages) (DLC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. (Rene Ellis) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Party Elects Habeas Case Remain Assigned to District Judge. (Scott Young) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. (Ryan Forrest) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed June 9, 2020, Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U. S. C. 2241 is denied and the case is dismissed. (DLC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Petitioners' Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed. Petitioners' Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #3 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/9/2020. (DLC)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Bennett, Tyree Yellow Elk, Rene Ellis, Ryan Patrick Forrest, Jonah Garza, Ian Gordon, Jahmal Green, Shavn Knox, Derek Lecompte, Tyrelle Lockett, Jimmy Malone, Matthew McLean, Matthew Middleton, Eric Ontiveros, Jeremy Pinson, Bobby Sunday, Clifford See Walker, Coty Travis Waters, Edwin Wike, Scott Young. (1 page)(MCO)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) RE: COVID-19 filed by Bobby Sunday, Ian Gordon, Coty Travis Waters, Jonah Garza, Jeremy Pinson, Jahmal Green, Anthony Bennett, Shavn Knox, Jimmy Malone, Ryan Patrick Forrest, Tyrelle Lockett, Derek Lecompte, Scott Young, Rene Ellis, Clifford See Walker, Matthew Middleton, Eric Ontiveros, Tyree Yellow Elk, Matthew McLean, Edwin Wike. (10 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Petitioners, #2 Envelope)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinson et al v. Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonah Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Wike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Sunday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coty Travis Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrelle Lockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rene Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyree Yellow Elk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford See Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shavn Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derek Lecompte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jahmal Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Patrick Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaun Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Montavis D Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?