Bakker v. Grant
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker
Defendant: Lori Grant
Case Number: 4:2020cv00301
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00301-TUC-RM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 10/19/19 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) as to Plaintiff. Show Cause Hearing is set for 10/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Raner C Collins. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BAC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline mailed x3 on 8/18/20. (BAC)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form mailed x2 on 7/31/20. (BAC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker: P.O. Box 35215, Tucson, AZ 85740. Parcels: 6281 N Oracle Rd., #35215, Tucson, AZ 85704 (MCO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-301-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (MYE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakker v. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?