Arreola v. Blanckensee
Petitioner: Sergio Arreola
Respondent: Barbara von Blanckensee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00351
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau (PS)
Referring Judge: David C Bury
2 Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc. #1 ), the Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction form and instructions, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General and to Respondent. The Eighth Amendment claim in Ground Three is dismissed. Respondent Barbara von Blanckensee must answer the Fifth Amendment claims in Grounds One through Three of the Petition within 20 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 10/5/2020. (ARC)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC032401. (MYE)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay $5 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Failure to comply will result in a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice, without further notice to Petitioner and denial of any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/20/20.(BAC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 *PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Sergio Arreola. (9 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MCO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 CorrectedPetition) (CEI). *Modified to indicate main document missing case number; corrected petition with case number added on 8/19/2020 (CEI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arreola v. Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Arreola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?