Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Debra F Davis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00355
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, and LRCiv 72.1, 72.2, and 72.3 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: No. CV-20-00355-TUC-JAS-DTF. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/3/20. (MYE)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge James A Soto. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00355-TUC-JAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/25/20. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General, United States Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18584981. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D. Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-355-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Debra F Davis. (Lake, Stephanie) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18584981 filed by Debra F Davis. (Lake, Stephanie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra F Davis
Represented By: Stephanie Elizabeth Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?