Reaves #339228 v. Davila et al
Plaintiff: James M Reaves, III
Defendant: Mark Brnovich, Jonathan Mosher, Hayley Weigold, Brian Hopkins, Barbara LaWall, Joseph Ricks and Jason Davila
Case Number: 4:2020cv00372
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed October 14, 2020, the complaint and this case are dismissed without prejudice. (DLC)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James M Reaves, III. The Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections or his/her designee must collect the $350.00 filing fee from Plaintiff's trust account in monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the account. The Clerk of Court must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, 1601 West Jefferson, Phoenix, Arizona, 85007. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 10/13/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed as not yet having accrued under Heck v. Humphrey. The Clerk of Court must enter Judgment of dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 10/13/2020.(See attached Order for complete details) (DLC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Subpoena Mark Napier as Pima County Sheriff by James M Reaves, III. (6 pgs) (BAC)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 *NOTICE re: FRCiv 5.2 Privacy Protection Guidelines. (BAC) *NEF regenerated on 9/1/2020 (CEI).
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: This case is subject to General Order 14-17, which supersedes General Order 14-14. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(BAC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James M Reaves, III. (2 pages). (BAC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James M Reaves, III. (2 pages). (BAC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by James M Reaves, III. (11 pages)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves #339228 v. Davila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Reaves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayley Weigold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara LaWall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?