Udell v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Madison Udell
Defendant: Tucson Medical Center and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00374
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucson Medical Center. (Rogers, Kathleen)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Tucson Medical Center. (SMJ)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tucson Medical Center.(Rogers, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madison Udell: Proof of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction upon United States of America on 9/11/20. (Mercaldo, Marco)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madison Udell: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/2/2020 to Tucson Medical Center . (Mercaldo, Marco)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America and Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Madison Udell. (Mercaldo, Marco)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Madison Udell. (Mercaldo, Marco)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Submitted filed by Madison Udell. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.2(a)(3)(Redacted Filings): Unless the court orders otherwise, in an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains the name of an individual known to be a minor, the filing may include only the minor's initials. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile Summons with only the minor's initials. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18621113. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-374-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Madison Udell. (Mercaldo, Marco) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MYE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18621113 filed by Madison Udell. (Mercaldo, Marco) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Udell v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucson Medical Center
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Udell
Represented By: Carlo Nathan Mercaldo
Represented By: Ronald D Mercaldo
Represented By: Marco B Mercaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?