Stross v. DeLarco et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: Joseph DeLarco, Duane DeLarco and First American Design & Construction Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00397
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The telephonic Rule 16 Pretrial Conference (Doc. #14 ) is rescheduled for Thursday, 1/7/2021 at 10:15 AM, before the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. The parties are directed to confer at least 21 days before the conference, in accordance with Rule 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P. Counsel shall file with the Court, at least seven (7) days before the scheduled conference, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties are expected to comply with Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. P., and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 11/5/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filed prior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 11/4/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 *Text of Proposed Order re: #17 Stipulation by Defendant First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (Curl, David) *Modified text to clarify on 11/4/2020 (DLC).
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time and Move Deadlines by First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (Curl, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First American Design & Construction Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent First American Design & Construction Incorporated for First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (Curl, David)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (SVC)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 11/20/2020 at 9:00 AM, before the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. The parties are directed to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., for the objectives of the conference. Counsel shall file with the Court, at least seven (7) days before the scheduled conference, a Joint Report. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties are expected to comply with Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. P., and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 10/27/2020. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (Curl, David)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by First American Design & Construction Incorporated.(Curl, David)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT ANSWER of Pro Per Defendants to #1 Complaint by Duane DeLarco and Joseph DeLarco.(DLC)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexander Stross: Proof of Service re: Complaint CORRECTED upon First American Design and Construction Inc. on 09/23/2020. (McKinney, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexander Stross: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon Joseph DeLarco on 09/24/2020. (McKinney, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexander Stross: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon Duane DeLarco on 09/23/2020. (McKinney, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexander Stross: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon First American Design and Construction Inc. on 09/23/2020. (McKinney, Robert) *Modified to reflect incorrect service document attached; correctly refiled at doc. #10 on 10/15/2020 (DLC).
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Alexander Stross. (McKinney, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Buckner McKinney on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Stross. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Duane DeLarco, Joseph DeLarco, First American Design & Construction Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 120) (SCA)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18675201. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00397-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Stross. (McKinney, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18675201 filed by Alexander Stross. (McKinney, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. DeLarco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph DeLarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane DeLarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Design & Construction Incorporated
Represented By: David L Curl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Robert Buckner McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?