Reed v. Trinity Services Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Reed
Defendant: Trinity Services Group Incorporated, Unknown Barr, Unknown Gaye, K Muko, Unknown Parties, P Tuozzo, Ruben Montano, David Merriman, Unknown Jones, Unknown Urrea, L Valisto and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 4:2020cv00522
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's #6 "Motion to Correct Clerical Error-Wrong Venue" is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court must transfer this case to the Phoenix Division for reassignment pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 3.7(e). The Clerk of Court must transfer to the Phoenix Division any subsequently filed documents in this this action that are filed in the Tucson Division. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 1/5/21. (BAC)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #3 , #4 Motions to Substitute Counsel. IT IS ORDERED Paul E Carter of the Attorney General's Office is terminated as counsel of record, and Randy J Aoyama and Bradley L Dunn of Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP be substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Merriman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Alexander B Chosid of TKC Holdings Incorporated is terminated as counsel of record, and Randy J Aoyama and Bradley L Dunn of Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP shall be substituted as counsel of record for the Defendant Trinity Services. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the docket accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 1/5/21. (BAC)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal (Defendant Trinity's Joinder in or Consent to Removal) by Defendant Trinity Services Group Incorporated. (Aoyama, Randy) *Modified docket text for clarity on 1/5/2021 (KAH).
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Phoenix Division by Kenneth W Reed. (3 pages) (ARC)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kenneth W Reed. (3 pages) (ARC)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Trinity Services Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aoyama, Randy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by David Merriman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of David Merriman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aoyama, Randy)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (ARC)
November 25, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Trinity Services Group Incorporated. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 5/5/2020); Answer by David Merriman with Jury Demand.(Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 11/19/2020))***ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(ARC)
November 25, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Waiver of Service of Summons by Trinity Services Group Incorporated. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 3/9/2020) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20195670. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18919540 filed by David Merriman.(Carter, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Trinity Services Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Services Group Incorporated
Represented By: Alexander B Chosid
Represented By: Tabitha Marjorie Bono
Represented By: Randy Jiro Aoyama
Represented By: Bradley Lynn Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Muko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Tuozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Merriman
Represented By: Paul Edward Carter
Represented By: Randy Jiro Aoyama
Represented By: Bradley Lynn Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Urrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Valisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?